This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:42:18 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Route 66 Restaurant Venue, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05284

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music, Inc.

Hifrost Publishing

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Amazement Music

Defendants

Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC

Denisha Johnson

Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC doing business as Route 66 Restaurant & Venue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory F. Harley

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP-ATL

Suite 1100, 171 17Th St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

Kwende B. Jones

Attorney at Burr & Forman

171 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Incorrect

1 #1

Exhibit Schedule

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Default as to Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC. (ah) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harley, Gregory) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that this action is STAYED only with respect to all claims against Defendant Denisha Johnson until further order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Acknowledgment by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harley, Gregory) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Jones, Kwende) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing re #7 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (anc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (anc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED AO 120 . (Harley, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Denisha Johnson. (sap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC. (sap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. Denisha Johnson, individually (Harley, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC d/b/a Route 66 Restaurant & Venue (Harley, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Amazement Music, Hip City Music, Inc. and Hifrost Publishing (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9114032). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule, #2 Summons Incorrect, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Stone Diamond Music Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwende B. Jones