This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:35:55 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. RGR Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against RGR Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Reidinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sea Gayle Music, LLC

Post Oak Publishing

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

House of Cash, Inc.

Eyeball Music

Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc.

Eleksylum Music, Inc.

Interior Music Corp.

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Eldorotto Music Publishing

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Lucky Thumb Music

Sony/ATV Songs, LLC

No Surrender Music

Noah's Little Boat Music

Bocephus Music, Inc.

Defendants

George Rizkallah

Richard Greene

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Keith Kapp

Attorney at Williams Mullen

P.O. Box 1000

Raleigh, NC 27602

 

Court Documents

29 #2

Exhibit B - Proof of Service Richard Greene

29 #1

Exhibit A - Proof of Service RGR Holdings, LLC d/b/a The Shak

#29

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by all plaintiffs as to the service of RGR Holdings, LLC, Richard Greene, and George Rizkallah. Defendants served 2/7/2020. Answer due 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service RGR Holdings, LLC d/b/a The Shak, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service Richard Greene, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service George Rizkallah)(Kapp, Michael) Modified docket text on 3/6/2020. (maf) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketA referral judge assigned to Copyright case in error. Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to case as instructed by Judge Reidinger's Chambers. (ejb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ni) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPORT on the filing or determination of a copyright action regarding copyright numbers Eu 243844, et al (see attached Schedule). (ni) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ni) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirit Music Group, Inc. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Gassed Hitties (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eldorotto Music Publishing (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sea Gayle Music, LLC (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Post Oak Publishing (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eyeball Music (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by House of Cash, Inc. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interior Music Corp. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Keith Kapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4344920), filed by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Eldorotto Music Publishing, Springtime Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Lucky Thumb Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Noah's Little Boat Music, No Surrender Music, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Big Gassed Hitties, Spirit Music Group, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Eyeball Music, Sea Gayle Music, LLC, Post Oak Publishing, Buzzard Rock Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Cover Sheet)(Kapp, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sea Gayle Music, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Interior Music Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bocephus Music, Inc. is a litigant