This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:11:12 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Please Rock Me, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Please Rock Me, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Elijah Blue Music

Beechwood Music Corporation

Benny Bird Company, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Peermusic III Ltd.

Unichappell Music, Inc.

Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.

Round Hill Carlin LLC

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Round Hill Carlin LLC doing business as Edward B. Marks Music Company

Defendants

Joseph White

Please Rock Me, LLC

John White

Joe White

David White

Please Rock Me, LLC doing business as 37 Main- A Rock Cafe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Troy R. Covington

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

Ryan T. Pumpian

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

Defendant Attorney

Charles David Joyner

Attorney at C. David Joyner, P.C.

Suite 130, 1305 Mall Of Georgia Blvd., Mill Creek Forest

Buford, GA 30519

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to September 30,2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/17/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Consent Motion

#13

(#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer by Please Rock Me, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Consent Motion)(Joyner, Charles) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct event type (dgr). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/20/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before 9/16/2019 by David White, John White, Joseph White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joyner, Charles) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Joseph White. Joseph White served on 8/16/2019. (Joyner, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#9

(#9) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. David White served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. Please Rock Me, LLC served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. John White served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#6

(#6) COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Elijah Blue Music, Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III Ltd., Round Hill Carlin LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Brazilian Music Inc. for Peermusic III Ltd.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent RH Carlin Holdings, LLC for Round Hill Carlin LLC. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit Song Schedule

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Covington, Troy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

2 #2

Summons John White

2 #1

Summons Joseph White

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to September 30,2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/17/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer by Please Rock Me, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Consent Motion)(Joyner, Charles) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct event type (dgr). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/20/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before 9/16/2019 by David White, John White, Joseph White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joyner, Charles) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Joseph White. Joseph White served on 8/16/2019. (Joyner, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. David White served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. Please Rock Me, LLC served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. John White served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Elijah Blue Music, Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III Ltd., Round Hill Carlin LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Brazilian Music Inc. for Peermusic III Ltd.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent RH Carlin Holdings, LLC for Round Hill Carlin LLC. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Covington, Troy) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Covington, Troy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Please Rock Me, LLC, David White, John White, Joseph White. (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph White, #2 Summons John White, #3 Summons David White)(dgr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (dgr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Round Hill Carlin LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd., Elijah Blue Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Beechwood Music Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8810314) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benny Bird Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Peermusic III, Ltd. is a litigant