This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 04:37:58 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against PJ's Pub Grill, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Crompton Songs

Gibb Brothers Music

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Eleksylum Music, Inc.

No Surrender Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. doing business as Praxis International Communications, Inc.

Defendants

Todd Richard Billingsley

Kris Parchuri

Patience Jay Jones

PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC

Jess Daniel Jones

PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC doing business as PJ's Pub & Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Andrew Schreck

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

Elizabeth Rose Sharrock

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Todd Richard Billingsley, Jess Daniel Jones, PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eleksylum Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patience Jay Jones, Kris Parchuri (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles Andrew Schreck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schreck, Charles) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2024085) by Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., No Surrender Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, No Surrender Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Todd Richard Billingsley, Jess Daniel Jones, PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eleksylum Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patience Jay Jones, Kris Parchuri (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles Andrew Schreck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schreck, Charles) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs. Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., No Surrender Music to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2024085) by Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., No Surrender Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, No Surrender Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. is a litigant