This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:33:28 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Office on Main LLC, The et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Office on Main LLC, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00692

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music Inc.

Terry Stafford Music Co.

Combine Music Corp.

Velvet Apple Music

Welsh Witch Music

Ben Peters Music

Hifrost Publishing

Cotillion Music, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Bocephus Music, Inc.

Get Loose Music, Inc.

Defendants

Office on Main LLC, The

Sherri Barrett

Office

Office on Main LLC, The doing business as Office on Main, The also known as Office, The

Office, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany Nichole Browning

Attorney at Rudnicki & Roche PLLC

6303 Waterford Blvd Ste 220

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Elizabeth Rose Sharrock

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

#21

20 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiffs have filed an agreed motion to extend deadline for defendants answer (Dkt. # 22). Plaintiff's represent that they and defendants are attempting to resolve this issue, that defendants have not yet obtained counsel, and that defendants have no objection to and join in this motion. Therefore, the motion (Dkt. #22) is granted. Defendants are directed to file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 2/12/2020 as requested. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to send a copy of this minute order to defendants, and to file a certificate of service of same, due forthwith. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/12/2020); granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sherri Barrett (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Office on Main LLC, The (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Cotillion Music, Inc.) by Cotillion Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.) by Songs of Universal, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music Inc. for Combine Music Corp.) by Combine Music Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velvet Apple Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hifrost Publishing (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hip City Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bocephus Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sherri Barrett, Office on Main LLC, The (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany Nichole Browning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Browning, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2152587) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Get Loose Music Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MAIN CORPORATION THE is a litigant

Latest cases where Terry Stafford Music Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant