This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:12:16 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Benny Bird Company Inc

Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing

Southfield Road Music

Fake and Jaded Music

Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music

Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs

Nashville Star Music

Tokeco Tunes

Less Than Zero Music

Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Sams Jammin Songs

Sony/ATV Songs, LLC

Interior Music Corp

Suffer in Silence Music

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Defendants

Justin Gilley

Tyler Schuman

Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P Pewitt

Attorney at JAMES P PEWITT LLC

2 North 20Th Street, Suite 925

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal, the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs claims against Defendants, without costs to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/25/20. (BJL) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Pewitt, James) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Justin Gilley. "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward." (BJL) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for service by certified mail filed by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Pewitt, James) (Entered: 02/15/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman filed by Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Benny Bird Company Inc, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Tokeco Tunes, Interior Music Corp, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Nashville Star Music, and Songs of Universal, Inc..(BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal, the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs claims against Defendants, without costs to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/25/20. (BJL) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Pewitt, James) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Justin Gilley. "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward." (BJL) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for service by certified mail filed by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Pewitt, James) (Entered: 02/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3537050 (receipt number B4601104144). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman filed by Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Benny Bird Company Inc, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Tokeco Tunes, Interior Music Corp, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Nashville Star Music, and Songs of Universal, Inc..(BJL). (Pewitt, James) Modified on 2/19/2020 (BJL). (Entered: 02/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman filed by Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Benny Bird Company Inc, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Tokeco Tunes, Interior Music Corp, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Nashville Star Music, and Songs of Universal, Inc..(BJL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fake and Jaded Music is a litigant

Latest cases where Benny Bird Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Fall Out Boy Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Interior Music Corp. is a litigant