This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2022 at 09:20:57 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lewis & Clarke's LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Lewis Clarke's LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

House of Cash, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Pie Eyed Groobee Music

Escatawpa Songs, LLC

Curb Records, Inc. doing business as Mike Curb Music

H W III Publishing

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Defendants

Lewis & Clarke's LLC doing business as Lewis & Clarke's Restaurant

Michael Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ian Garrett McFarland

Attorney at Merchant & Gould P.C. (Knoxville Office)

9717 Cogdill Road, Suite 101

Knoxville, TN 37932

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SUMMONS returned executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., H W III Publishing, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Cash, Inc.. Lewis & Clarke's LLC served on 6/17/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

18 #1

Attachment Schedule A

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Attachment Schedule A

17 #17

Main Document

16 #1

Attachment Schedule A

16 #16

Main Document

15 #1

Attachment Schedule A

15 #15

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/25/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to Michael Anthony and Lewis & Clarke's LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/21/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#2

NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Schedule

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS returned executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., H W III Publishing, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Cash, Inc.. Lewis & Clarke's LLC served on 6/17/2022. (McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by H W III Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Curb Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Escatawpa Songs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pie Eyed Groobee Music. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by House of Cash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Songs of Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Broadcast Music, Inc., Curb Records, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, H W III Publishing, House of Cash, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McFarland, Ian) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/25/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to Michael Anthony and Lewis & Clarke's LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/21/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Ian Garrett McFarland admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PLAINTIFFS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Anthony and Lewis & Clarke's LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3600318) filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., H W III Publishing, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Cash, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Escatawpa Songs L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Songs of Universal, Inc. is a litigant