This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:39:37 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. L & J Caissey Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against L J Caissey Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam E Haddon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Screen Gems-EMI, Inc.

Springtime Music, Inc.

Gold Hill Music, Inc.

Southfield Road Music

Fake and Jaded Music

Rondor Music International Inc

Crooked Chimney Music Inc.

Less Than Zero Music

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc.

Rondor Music International Inc doing business as Irving Music

Defendants

L & J Caissey Inc.

The Original Grub Stake

The Grubstake Lounge

Louis Caissey, Jr.

Jeanette Caissey

L & J Caissey Inc. doing business as Grub Stake also known as The Original Grub Stake also known as The Grubstake Lounge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert C. Lukes

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Song Schedule

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Dismissal due by 4/24/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal on or before April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/3/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents Robert C. Lukes appearing for Plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lukes, Robert) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED: The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/5/2020. (HEG) Modified on 3/5/2020 copy of order mailed to defendants. (HEG). Modified on 3/6/2020 to correct typo (HEG). (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Less Than Zero Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Springtime Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Lukes, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Louis Caissey, Jr. Original sent via US Mail to Plaintiffs' counsel. (JEH) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Submission of Proposed Summons as to Louis Caissey, Jr, re #1 Complaint, (Lukes, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Less Than Zero Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Springtime Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Lukes, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jeanette Caissey, L & J Caissey Inc (one summons listed both defendants). (JEH) Modified on 2/4/2020 - Original sent via US mail to plaintiffs' counsel. (JEH). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2437047. (JEH) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jeanette Caissey, Louis Caissey, Jr, L & J Caissey Inc., filed by Screen Gems-EMI, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Southfield Road Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Springtime Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Less Than Zero Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B) (JEH) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Hill Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fake and Jaded Music is a litigant

Latest cases where Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc. is a litigant