This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 11:48:58 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Karl of Pasco, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Karl of Pasco, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Whittemore and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00955

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Whittemore

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Carl Perkins Music, Inc.

Crompton Songs

Arc/Conrad Music LLC

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Jay-Boy Music Corp.

Hydroponic Music

Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb

Sugarfuzz Music, Inc.

Embassy Music Corporation

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Big Bang Music

Beechwood Music Corporation

Sugarfuzz Music, Inc. doing business as Sugarfuzz Music

Arc/Conrad Music LLC doing business as Arc Music

Defendants

Karl of Pasco, Inc.

The Reef

Joseph Karl, Jr.

Karl Reef Bar

Karl of Pasco, Inc. doing business as Karl Reef also known as The Reef also known as Karl Reef Bar & Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank R. Jakes

Attorney at Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP

401 E Jackson St Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602-5228

Zachary David Messa

Attorney at Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP

911 Chestnut St, Po Box 1368

Clearwater, FL 33757

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 5/21/2019. (SMA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Big Bang Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Embassy Music Corporation, Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb, Hydroponic Music, Jay-Boy Music Corp., Rondor Music International, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Messa, Zachary) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LSS) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Karl, Jr, Karl of Pasco, Inc. (LSS) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (CAB) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons Summons Joseph Karl, Jr.

1 #3

Proposed Summons Summons Karl of Pasco, Inc.

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15380028) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Karl of Pasco, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Summons Joseph Karl, Jr.)(Messa, Zachary) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 5/21/2019. (SMA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Big Bang Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Embassy Music Corporation, Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb, Hydroponic Music, Jay-Boy Music Corp., Rondor Music International, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Messa, Zachary) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LSS) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Karl, Jr, Karl of Pasco, Inc. (LSS) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (CAB) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James D. Whittemore and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-955-T-27AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15380028) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Karl of Pasco, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Summons Joseph Karl, Jr.)(Messa, Zachary) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Reef is a litigant

Latest cases where SUGARFUZZ MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jay-Boy Music Corporation is a litigant