This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:33:58 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. JKPatrum, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against JKPatrum, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing

Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs

Broadcast Music Inc

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC

TGM LLC

Fall Out Boy Inc

Sony-ATV Songs LLC

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC doing business as Universal Music Z Songs

Fall Out Boy Inc doing business as Chicago X Softcore Songs

TGM LLC doing business as Glitch Mob Publishing, The

Defendants

JKPatrum, LLC d/b/a The Venue

Kristi Patrum

Jeremy Patrum

JKPatrum, LLC

JKPatrum, LLC doing business as Venue, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey D Harty

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

700 Walnut, Suite 1600, Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney pursuant to similar case 19cv2067 and direction from chambers. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (des) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TGM LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Fall Out Boy Inc, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC. All Defendants. Answer due 1/9/2020. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text and ddln on 12/26/2019 (ksy). (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TGM LLC (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fall Out Boy Inc (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/12/2019. (kms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 form mailed to Register of Copyrights in Washington, D.C. (kms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2019. (kms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. (kms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3067059.), filed by TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs. Dismissal Deadline 3/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing is a litigant

Latest cases where Fall Out Boy Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant