This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:42:39 (UTC).

BROADCAST MUSIC INC et al v. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 BROADCAST MUSIC INC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against J K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02742

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELSH WITCH MUSIC

SONY ATV SONGS LLC

BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP

EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.

FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS

SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC

FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC.

BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC

TOKECO TUNES

CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC

RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC

ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS

BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.

UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC

CROMPTON SONGS

GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC

NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC

Defendants

J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC

KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC

MICHAEL HALL

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZACHARY DAVID MESSA

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR ETC - CLEARWATER FL

911 Chestnut St

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendant Attorney

M. KEVIN HAUSFELD

Attorney at KEVIN HAUSFELD PA

400 N Pace Boulevard, 32505

Pensacola, FL 32505

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/11/2020. (alb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, FALL OUT BOY INC, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC; Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC; Corporate Parent Bertelsmann, Inc. for BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC; Corporate Parent TENGA, Inc. for BROADCAST MUSIC INC.. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. MICHAEL HALL served on 2/22/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC. (alb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Proposed Summonses by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO., NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC re 3 Docket Annotation, #1 Complaint,,, (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#4

(#4) AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (alb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4844796.), filed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., HINDER MUSIC CO., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/11/2020. (alb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, FALL OUT BOY INC, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC; Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC; Corporate Parent Bertelsmann, Inc. for BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC; Corporate Parent TENGA, Inc. for BROADCAST MUSIC INC.. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. MICHAEL HALL served on 2/22/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC. (alb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Proposed Summonses by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO., NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC re 3 Docket Annotation, #1 Complaint,,, (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (alb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (alb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (alb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4844796.), filed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., HINDER MUSIC CO., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (MESSA, ZACHARY) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fall Out Boy Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fourteenth Hour Music Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant