This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:20:17 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Hochatown Saloon, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hochatown Saloon, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00417

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Round Hill Music, LP

Post Oak Publishing

Tokeco Tunes

Sony/ATV Songs, LLC

Hell Pony Music

Bocephus Music, Inc.

Round Hill Music, LP doing business as Round Hill Works

Sony/ATV Songs, LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Defendants

Hochatown Saloon, LLC

Scott Christian

Hochatown Saloon, LLC doing business as Hochatown Saloon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth R. Sharrock

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

Tiffany Browning

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC) by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Post Oak Publishing (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Round Hill Music, LP (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hell Pony Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tokeco Tunes (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/15/2020: added Other Affiliate (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bocephus Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hochatown Saloon, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Christian (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany Browning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Browning, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth R. Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/11/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1324048 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Round Hill Music, LP, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Tokeco Tunes (Sharrock, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 12/16/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Scott Christian, Hochatown Saloon, LLC by Bocephus Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Round Hill Music, LP, Tokeco Tunes, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Round Hill Music, LP, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Tokeco Tunes (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bocephus Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Songs LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant