This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:15:23 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc. et al v. Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Tap It Local et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc d/b/a Tap It Local. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Robert G. Doumar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00558

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Robert G. Doumar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Get Loose Music Inc.

Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture

Broadcast Music Inc.

MJ Publishing Trust

Welsh Witch Music

Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc.

Interior Music Corp.

No Surrender Music, A Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Eleksylum Music Inc.

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Universal Music MGB NA LLC

Defendants

Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc.

Ashley McGrath

Chris McGrath

Rodney Rountree

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Spain Flowers

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (VA Beach)

222 Central Park Ave, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

David Mitchell Asbury

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (VA Beach)

222 Central Park Ave, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Mitchell Hendrick

Attorney at Ruloff Swain Haddad Morecock Talbert & Woodward, PC

317 30Th Street

Virginia Beach, VA 23451

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

22 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#22

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/4/19 and filed 12/5/19. (lbax, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Referred for 16(b). (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to Complaint by Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc., Ashley McGrath, Chris McGrath, Rodney Rountree.(Hendrick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. See order for details. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/12/2019. (clou ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (clou) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc.. (Hendrick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc., Ashley McGrath, Chris McGrath, Rodney Rountree. (Hendrick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc., Ashley McGrath, Chris McGrath, Rodney Rountree. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendrick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc., Ashley McGrath, Chris McGrath, Rodney Rountree. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music, A Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.(Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.(Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music Inc.. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc.. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons on Defendant Granby Street Sports Bar, Inc. d/b/a Tap It Local by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music Inc., Get Loose Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust d/b/a MIJAC Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons on Defendant Rodney Rountree by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music Inc., Get Loose Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust d/b/a MIJAC Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons on Defendant Chris McGrath by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music Inc., Get Loose Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust d/b/a MIJAC Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons on Defendant Ashley McGrath by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music Inc., Get Loose Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust d/b/a MIJAC Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music. (Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6893840.), filed by EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., a Joint Venture d/b/a Kirshner CBS Musi Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Broadcast Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Get Loose Music Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Beechwood Music Corporation, Eleksylum Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust d/b/a MIJAC Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flowers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Don Kirschner Entertainment Company and Craven, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Get Loose Music Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant