This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:40:20 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Fulton on Tap, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Fulton on Tap, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02681

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Sloopy II Inc.

Boy Meets Girl Music

Unichappell Music Inc.

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Da Crippler Publishing

EMI Consortium Songs Inc.

Carl Perkins Music, Inc.

Rick's Music, Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Crompton Songs

Gibb Brothers Music

Soar Loser Music

Red Sea Songs

EWC Publishing Co.

Collipark Music

Defendants

Shawn Breaud

Kyle Roberts

NOLA Grind, LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A. Balkin

Attorney at Hardy, Carey, Chautin & Balkin, LLP (Mandeville)

1080 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Joseph C. Chautin, III

Attorney at Hardy, Carey, Chautin & Balkin, LLP (Mandeville)

1080 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant Attorneys

Sheri M. Morris

Attorney at Daigle Fisse & Kessenich

P.O. Box 5350, 8480 Bluebonnet Blvd., Suite F

Covington, LA 70434-5350

Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.

Attorney at Daigle Fisse & Kessenich

P.O. Box 5350, 8480 Bluebonnet Blvd., Suite F

Covington, LA 70434-5350

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Bench Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed on the notice. By Clerk. (kac) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Breaud, NOLA Grind, LLC, Kyle Roberts, Shane Songy.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fulton on Tap, LLC.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text/linkage on 6/18/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than 06/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/30/2019. (am) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fulton on Tap LLC, Nola Grind LLC, Shane Songy, Shawn Breaud, Kyle Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Fulton on Tap, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Nola Grind LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shane Songy(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Kyle Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shawn Breaud(pty:dft).(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (am). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shawn Breaud served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Fulton on Tap, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; NOLA Grind, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Kyle Roberts served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Shane Songy served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7494812) filed by Crompton Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EWC Publishing Co., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Boy Meets Girl Music, Rick's Music, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Collipark Music, Soar Loser Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Red Sea Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Mark A. Balkin added to party Boy Meets Girl Music(pty:pla), Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Carl Perkins Music, Inc.(pty:pla),Collipark Music(pty:pla), Crompton Songs(pty:pla),Da Crippler Publishing(pty:pla),EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.(pty:pla), EMI Consortium Songs Inc. (pty:pla), EWC Publishing Co.(pty:pla), Gibb Brothers Music(pty:pla), Red Sea Songs(pty:pla), Rick's Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla), Sloopy II Inc.(pty:pla), Soar Loser Music(pty:pla), Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:pla), Unichappell Music Inc.(pty:pla).(Balkin, Mark) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #7 AO Form 121) (am). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Bench Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed on the notice. By Clerk. (kac) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer to Complaint.**Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (am) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Breaud, NOLA Grind, LLC, Kyle Roberts, Shane Songy.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fulton on Tap, LLC.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text/linkage on 6/18/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than 06/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/30/2019. (am) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fulton on Tap LLC, Nola Grind LLC, Shane Songy, Shawn Breaud, Kyle Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Fulton on Tap, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Nola Grind LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shane Songy(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Kyle Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shawn Breaud(pty:dft).(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (am). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shawn Breaud served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Fulton on Tap, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; NOLA Grind, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Kyle Roberts served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Shane Songy served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Shawn Breaud, Fulton on Tap, LLC, NOLA Grind, L.L.C, Kyle Roberts, Shane Songy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Crompton Songs, Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., EWC Publishing Co., Gibb Brothers Music, Red Sea Songs, Rick's Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., Soar Loser Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music Inc.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc. ; Corporate Parent Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. for Rick's Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7494812) filed by Crompton Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EWC Publishing Co., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Boy Meets Girl Music, Rick's Music, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Collipark Music, Soar Loser Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Red Sea Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Mark A. Balkin added to party Boy Meets Girl Music(pty:pla), Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Carl Perkins Music, Inc.(pty:pla),Collipark Music(pty:pla), Crompton Songs(pty:pla),Da Crippler Publishing(pty:pla),EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.(pty:pla), EMI Consortium Songs Inc. (pty:pla), EWC Publishing Co.(pty:pla), Gibb Brothers Music(pty:pla), Red Sea Songs(pty:pla), Rick's Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla), Sloopy II Inc.(pty:pla), Soar Loser Music(pty:pla), Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:pla), Unichappell Music Inc.(pty:pla).(Balkin, Mark) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #7 AO Form 121) (am). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rick's Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Carl Perkins Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EWC PUBLISHING, CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant