This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 10:36:10 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. EventsSB, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against EventsSB, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02614

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Crompton Songs

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

The Bernard Edwards Company LLC

Embassy Music Corporation, -

House of Cash, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Sony ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

Sony ATV Songs LLC

Defendants

Mark Anthony Lawrence

EventsSB, LLC d/b/a M8RX Nightclub & Lounge a/k/a Matrix Nightclub & Lounge

EventsSB, LLC

Matrix Nightclub and Lounge

EventsSB, LLC doing business as M8RX Nightclub and Lounge also known as Matrix Nightclub and Lounge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AnnMarie Mori

Attorney at TroyGould PC

1801 Century Park East 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2367

Russell I Glazer

Attorney at TroyGould PC

1801 Century Park East 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2367

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Olufs

Attorney at Law Office of Matthew Olufs

1114 State Street Suite 313

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence.(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #18 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time by which the Defendants are to file an answer or other response to the Complaint is extended by an additional seven days, up to and including 6/12/2019. The Court's Order to Show Cause #14 is discharged. (gk) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

18 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Answer

#18

(#18) Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 12, 2019 filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Answer)(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#17

(#17) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence.(Attorney Matthew Olufs added to party Mark Anthony Lawrence(pty:dft))(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Initial Response to Complaint filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC.(Attorney Matthew Olufs added to party EventsSB, LLC(pty:dft))(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #14 (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 5/23/2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) EventsSB, LLC; Mark Anthony Lawrence did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., identifying See attached certificate. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#1

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence.(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence.(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #18 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time by which the Defendants are to file an answer or other response to the Complaint is extended by an additional seven days, up to and including 6/12/2019. The Court's Order to Show Cause #14 is discharged. (gk) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 12, 2019 filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Answer)(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC, Mark Anthony Lawrence.(Attorney Matthew Olufs added to party Mark Anthony Lawrence(pty:dft))(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Initial Response to Complaint filed by Defendant EventsSB, LLC.(Attorney Matthew Olufs added to party EventsSB, LLC(pty:dft))(Olufs, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #14 (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 5/23/2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) EventsSB, LLC; Mark Anthony Lawrence did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant Mark Anthony Lawrence served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mac Kreidman - Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant EventsSB, LLC served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mac Kreidman - Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., identifying See attached certificate. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23505619 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attorney AnnMarie Mori added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mori, AnnMarie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Embassy Music Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant