This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:34:25 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Interior Music Corp.

Defendants

Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront

Eva Malki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen Susanna Frank

Attorney at Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass, LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Thomas Andrews Harvey

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Foram Dave

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. Eva Malki served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Mail service complete 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Mail service complete 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Andrews Harvey (Harvey, Thomas) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Foram Dave (Dave, Foram) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC.. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#9

(#9) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. re #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement(cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Eva Malki, Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC re #1 Complaint, (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14130706.). Filed bySony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. Eva Malki served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Mail service complete 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Mail service complete 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Andrews Harvey (Harvey, Thomas) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Foram Dave (Dave, Foram) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC.. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. re #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement(cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Eva Malki, Eve15 LLC d/b/a Eve's Waterfront. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC re #1 Complaint, (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14130706.). Filed bySony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Interior Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frank, Karen) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Interior Music Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Songs LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant