This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:14:44 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Dusty Bottle LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Dusty Bottle LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Concord Music Group, Inc.

Cotillion Music, Inc.

Escatawpa Songs, LLC

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Peermusic III Ltd.

Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.

Rondor Music International, Inc. doing business as Irving Music

Concord Music Group, Inc. doing business as Jondora Music

Cotillion Music, Inc. doing business as Pronto Music

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Defendants

Dusty Bottle LLC

Larry Pike

Dusty Bottle LLC doing business as The Dusty Bottle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew S. Borick, Esq.

Attorney at Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC

199 Main Street, P.O. Box 190

Burlington, VT 05402-0190

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Schedule

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dusty Bottle LLC served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Larry Pike served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Borick, Matthew) Text clarified on 8/23/2019 (jlh) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAILED: Form AO 121 to Register of Copyrights (Document image is sealed). (pac) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp. (pac) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dusty Bottle LLC, Larry Pike filed by Stone Diamond Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Peermusic III Ltd., Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Rondor Music International, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Escatawpa Songs L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Fourteenth Hour Music Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Stone Diamond Music Corp is a litigant