This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:11:27 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Drunken Monkeyz, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Drunken Monkeyz, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00377

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blue Horn Toad Music

Broadcast Music Inc

House of Cash Inc.

Defendants

Drunken Monkeyz, LLC

Heffernan Brian

Brian Heffernan

Drunken Monkeyz, LLC doing business as Drunken Monkeyz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael David LeBlanc

Attorney at Greer Herz and Adams

2525 S Shore Blvd, Ste 203

League City, TX 77573

Margaret Anne Boulware

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2603 Augusta Dr., Suite 1350

Houston, TX 77057

J Scott Andrews

Attorney at Greer, Herz and Adams

One Moody Plaza, 18Th Floor

Galveston, TX 77550

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#2

2 #1

Supplement

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Drunken Monkeyz, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Drunken Monkeyz, LLC, filed.(Andrews, J) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (agould, 3) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 9:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Drunken Monkeyz, LLC, Brian Heffernan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blue Horn Toad Music, Broadcast Music Inc, House of Cash Inc., filed.(LeBlanc, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Horn Toad Music, Broadcast Music Inc, House of Cash Inc., filed.(LeBlanc, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(LeBlanc, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Drunken Monkeyz, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23567884) filed by Broadcast Music Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(LeBlanc, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where House of Cash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Broadcast Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael David LeBlanc

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R Scott Andrews