This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:54:49 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Diamond Girls Bartenders, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Diamond Girls Bartenders, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00806

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reservoir Media Management Inc.

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Fuel Publishing, Inc.

Velvet Apple Music

Reservoir One America

Shelby Singleton Music, Inc.

Tremonti Stapp Music

Cyanide Publishing

Beechwood Music Corporation

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Reservoir Media Management Inc. doing business as Reservoir 416 also known as Reservoir One America

Fuel Publishing, Inc. doing business as Pener Pig Publishing

Defendants

Mary Ortiz

Diamond Girls Bartenders, LLC

Diamond Girls Bartenders, LLC doing business as Rhinestone Cowgirls

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hannah L. Woofter

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing Song Schedule by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Fuel Publishing, Inc., Reservoir Media Management Inc., Shelby Singleton Music, Inc., Tremonti Stapp Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music re #1 Complaint, (Woofter, Hannah) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #2

Schedule 7.1 Certificate of Interest

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hannah L. Woofter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6522774. Service due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Schedule 7.1 Certificate of Interest)(Woofter, Hannah) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Diamond Girls Bartenders, LLC, Mary Ortiz. (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of filing Song Schedule by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Fuel Publishing, Inc., Reservoir Media Management Inc., Shelby Singleton Music, Inc., Tremonti Stapp Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music re #1 Complaint, (Woofter, Hannah) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hannah L. Woofter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6522774. Service due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Schedule 7.1 Certificate of Interest)(Woofter, Hannah) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Resorvoir One America is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant