This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:55:20 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Del Rancho, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Del Rancho, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music Inc.

House of Bryant Publications, LLC

Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Embassy Music Corporation

Velvet Apple Music

Contessa Publishing, LLC

Hifrost Publishing

Spirit One Music

Benny Bird Company, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Conducive Music

Bocephus Music, Inc.

E.O. Smith Music

Defendants

Mary Ann Gross

Del Rancho, LLC

Luis Zambrano

Luis Flores

Del Rancho, LLC doing business as El Cowboy Tex Mex Grill & Saloon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E. Chudakoff

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Summons Mary Ann Gross

1 #5

Summons Luis Zambrano

1 #4

Summons Luis Flores

1 #3

Summons to Del Rancho, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order of Dismissal Pending is Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #8 ), treated as a motion to dismiss. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) provides that an action may be dismissed by the plaintiff without order of court by filing "a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment." For good cause shown, the motion is granted. The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Each party is to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/6/2020. (JLG) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this action was filed on 2/13/2020. Defendants were duly served with summons and the Complaint (see ECF Nos. #5 , #6 ); but, have failed to plead or otherwise defend. Accordingly, on or before 4/10/2020, counsel for Plaintiff should file with the Clerk of Court and serve upon Defendants an appropriate application for entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) and an appropriate motion, affidavit, and proposed order for default judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/3/2020. (JLG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mary Ann Gross on 2/18/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #4 . (J,FE) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Del Rancho, LLC on 2/18/2020; Luis Flores on 2/18/2020; Luis Zambrano on 2/18/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #4 . (J,FE) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Del Rancho, LLC, receipt #7005 1160 0004 5869 4198, Luis Flores, receipt #7005 1160 0004 5869 4174, Mary Ann Gross, receipt 3700 5116 0004 5869 4181, Luis Zambrano, receipt # 7005 1160 0004 5869 4167 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,K) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (W,K) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (W,K) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement - identifying Tegna, Inc as a corporate parent of Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Group Global Ltd. as a corporate parent for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Spirit Music Group, Inc. as a corporate parent of Spirit One Music, and Vivendi SA as a corporate parent of Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc. - filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Del Rancho, LLC, Luis Flores, Mary Ann Gross, Luis Zambrano. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9792373.. Filed by Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Spirit One Music, Hip City Music Inc., Broadcast Music Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Velvet Apple Music, E.O. Smith Music, Conducive Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Contessa Publishing, LLC, House of Bryant Publications, LLC, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Benny Bird Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Del Rancho, LLC, #4 Summons Luis Flores, #5 Summons Luis Zambrano, #6 Summons Mary Ann Gross) (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where House of Bryant Publications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Contessa Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Benny Bird Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Embassy Music Corp is a litigant