This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:06:59 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick J. Scullin, Jr and Christian F. Hummel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00637

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederick J. Scullin, Jr

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music Inc.

Crompton Songs

Gibb Brothers Music

Hifrost Publishing

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Welsh Witch Music

E.O. Smith Music

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Defendants

DeJohn's on Lark, Inc.

Alessio F. Depoli

Christopher M. Pratt

The Upper Room

John W. DeJohn

DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. doing business as Pearl Street Pub also known as The Upper Room

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark S. Sidoti

Attorney at Gibbons, Del Deo Law Firm

One Pennsylvania Plaza, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on John W. DeJohn on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on Christopher M. Pratt on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. d/b/a Pearl Street Pub a/k/a The Upper Room on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. Christopher M. Pratt served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. John W. DeJohn served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation.. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) [mailed on 5/30/2019] (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

3 #3

Summons Issued as to Alessio Depoli

3 #2

Summons Issued as to Christopher Pratt

3 #1

Summons Issued as to John DeJohn

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to John W. DeJohn, DeJohn's on Lark, Inc., Alessio F. Depoli and Christopher M. Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to John DeJohn, #2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Pratt, #3 Summons Issued as to Alessio Depoli) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#2

(#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/21/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John W. DeJohn, DeJohn's on Lark, Inc., Alessio F. Depoli and Christopher M. Pratt (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4755462) filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing and Welsh Witch Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on John W. DeJohn on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on Christopher M. Pratt on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on Alessio F. DePoli on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice re: General Order #25; Case Management Plan; Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations; Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge (Document Entry #2) served on DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. d/b/a Pearl Street Pub a/k/a The Upper Room on 6/13/19, filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. Christopher M. Pratt served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. John W. DeJohn served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. Alessio F. Depoli served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music. DeJohn's on Lark, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, E.O. Smith Music, Gibb Brothers Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation.. (Sidoti, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) [mailed on 5/30/2019] (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to John W. DeJohn, DeJohn's on Lark, Inc., Alessio F. Depoli and Christopher M. Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to John DeJohn, #2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Pratt, #3 Summons Issued as to Alessio Depoli) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/21/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John W. DeJohn, DeJohn's on Lark, Inc., Alessio F. Depoli and Christopher M. Pratt (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4755462) filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Hifrost Publishing and Welsh Witch Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Songs LLC is a litigant