This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:21:43 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Dajerabby, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Dajerabby, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02067

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.

Combine Music Corp.

Eleksylum Music, Inc.

Welsh Witch Music

Rick Springfield Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Broadcast Music Inc

Broken Arrow Music Corporation

No Surrender Music

Eleksylum Music, Inc

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp

Combine Music Corp

Defendants

Dajerabby, Inc. d/b/a Screaming Eagle American Bar & Grill

Ivan Wieland

Dajerabby, Inc

Dajerabby, Inc doing business as Screaming Eagle American Bar & Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey D Harty

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

700 Walnut, Suite 1600, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Defendant Attorney

Michael Dale Youngblut

Attorney at Coonrad & Youngblut PC

315 5Th Street, Po Box 603, Ecf

Hudson, IA 50643

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Ivan Wieland Acknowledgement filed by Broadcast Music Inc, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music, Inc, No Surrender Music, Rick Springfield Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Welsh Witch Music. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Dajerabby, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Broadcast Music Inc, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music, Inc, No Surrender Music, Rick Springfield Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Welsh Witch Music. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant Dajerabby, Inc., LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2019. (skm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Wieland.(Youngblut, Michael) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (skm). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Welsh Witch Music (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rick Springfield Music (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Elektra/Asylum/Nonesuch Records for Eleksylum Music, Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Combine Music Corp identifying Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. for Combine Music Corp. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broken Arrow Music Corporation. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (skm). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (skm). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE re #1 Complaint: AO 121 and Complaint with Exhibit A mailed to Register of Copyrights. (skm) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Set Deadline: Plaintiffs' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 11/14/2019. (skm) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Wieland. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3048947), filed by Broadcast Music Inc. Scheduling Report deadline 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text to correct deadline on 10/25/2019 (skm). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broken Arrow Music, Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where No Surrender Music, a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Combine Music Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Eleksylum Music Inc is a litigant