This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 11:00:10 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Cottage Street Crew LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cottage Street Crew LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is R Bryan Harwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01422

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Bryan Harwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc

Concord Music Group Inc

Jayboy Music Corp

Fuel Publishing Inc

Cyanide Publishing

Broadcast Music Inc

BMG Rights Management (US) LLC

BMG Rights Management (US) LLC doing business as BMG Platinum Songs (US)

Concord Music Group Inc doing business as Jondora Music

Fuel Publishing Inc doing business as Pener Pig Publishing

Defendants

Christopher Scrudato

Cottage Street Crew LLC

Cottage Street Crew LLC doing business as Harley's Roadhouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bernie W Ellis

Attorney at Burr and Forman LLP

Po Box 447

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorney

Cheveron T Scott

Po Box 80

Darlington, SC 29540

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Affidavit of Service

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Cottage Street Crew LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

10 #1

Affidavit of Service

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Christopher Scrudato served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#9

(#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/7/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/7/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motions due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 2/23/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for trial. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 06/01/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 06/10/2019. (lsut, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cottage Street Crew LLC.(Scott, Cheveron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Scrudato.(Scott, Cheveron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. Confirmation attached. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato. Service due by 8/14/2019. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Schedule 7.1

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Cyanide Publishing, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule 7.1)(lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Schedule of Songs

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8446306), filed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Songs) (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Cottage Street Crew LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Christopher Scrudato served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/7/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/7/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motions due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 2/23/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for trial. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 06/01/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 06/10/2019. (lsut, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cottage Street Crew LLC.(Scott, Cheveron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Scrudato.(Scott, Cheveron) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. Confirmation attached. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato. Service due by 8/14/2019. (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Cyanide Publishing, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule 7.1)(lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8446306), filed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Songs) (lsut, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Concord Music Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. is a litigant