This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:32:52 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc., et al v. Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Mary Ann Vial Lemmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music Inc.

Ghostown Thang Music

Hifrost Publishing

Ground Control Music

Carl Mo Music

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Defendants

Chris Anderson

Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A. Balkin

Attorney at Hardy, Carey, Chautin & Balkin, LLP (Mandeville)

1080 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Chris Anderson served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Chris Anderson, Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Mo Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Ghostown Thang Music, Ground Control Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8097070) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney Mark A. Balkin added to All Plaintiffs.(Balkin, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020: #4 AO Form) (sbs). Modified text on 1/21/2020 (sbs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/21/2020) (sbs). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Chris Anderson served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Chris Anderson, Columbia Street Rock N' Blues Cafe, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Mo Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Ghostown Thang Music, Ground Control Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. (Balkin, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8097070) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney Mark A. Balkin added to All Plaintiffs.(Balkin, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020: #4 AO Form) (sbs). Modified text on 1/21/2020 (sbs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/21/2020) (sbs). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ground Control Music is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant