This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:27:10 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Buford Joes Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Buford Joes Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Jean-Paul Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01230

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mark H. Cohen

Jean-Paul Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Fuel Publishing Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Cyanide Publishing

Sugarfuzz Music, Inc.

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Sugarfuzz Music, Inc. doing business as Sugarfuzz Music

Fuel Publishing Inc. doing business as Pener Pig Publishing

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Defendants

Buford Joes Inc.

George Watt

Joe

Buford Joes Inc. doing business as Joe's also known as Joe's Sports Grill also known as Joe's Sports Bar & Grill also known as Joe's Bar & Restaurant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Troy R. Covington

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

Ryan T. Pumpian

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Garrett Strickland

Attorney at Lee & Hayes PLLC

100 Colony Square, Suite 2000, 1175 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30361

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Initial disclosures shall be made no later than June 19, 2019. Discovery begins June 19, 2019, and closes on October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/3/19. (ddm) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 26.1 by Buford Joes Inc., George Watt.(Strickland, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Initial Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc..(Covington, Troy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-01230-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bnw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Buford Joes Inc., George Watt. Discovery ends on 10/17/2019.(Strickland, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Buford Joes Inc. Answer due 5/20/2019; George Watt Answer due 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/14/19. (bnw) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Covington, Troy) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Buford Joes Inc., George Watt re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (bnw) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Buford Joes Inc. Answer due 5/13/2019; George Watt Answer due 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/1/19. (bnw) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc. Buford Joes Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 4/16/2019 (bnw). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music Inc.; Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/27/19. (bnw) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnw) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (tmf) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILED IN ERROR Initial Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc..(Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/28/2019 to edit text(bnw). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Buford Joes Inc., George Watt. (Attachments: #1 Summons George Watt)(tmf) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8518587) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUGARFUZZ MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where JOE (UNKNOWN) is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant