This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:41:38 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Bawa Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Bawa Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie A. Gallagher and J. Mark Coulson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03127

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephanie A. Gallagher

J. Mark Coulson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Wacissa River Music, Inc.

Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.

Hip City Music, Inc.

Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music

Velvet Apple Music

Welsh Witch Music

Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers

Rising George Music

Boy Meets Girl Music

Tokeco Tunes

Hilfrost Publishing

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Jeff Diggs Music

Universal Music MGB NA, LLC

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Defendants

Rajpal Singh

Harpal Singh

Bawa Inc. d/b/a Sizzle

Bawa, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Max S Stadfeld

Attorney at Wright, Constable & Skeen, L.L.P.

7 Saint Paul Street, 18Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorney

Frank V Boozer, Jr

Attorney at Covahey Boozer Devan & Dore PA

614 Bosley Ave

Towson, MD 21204

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#3

2 #1

Attachment

#2

1 #5

Summons Harpal Singh

1 #4

Summons Rajpal Singh

1 #3

Summons Bawa, Inc.

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment Schedule

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MARGINAL ORDER approving #19 Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/27/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Status Report Submitted by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music (Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/26/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/26/2019. (daws, Chambers) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/26/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Status Report Submitted by Bawa, Inc., Harpal Singh, Rajpal Singh (Boozer, Frank) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Status Report Submitted by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music (Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/2/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Bawa, Inc..(Boozer, Frank) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendants Bawa, Inc. d/b/a Sizzle and Rajpal Singh by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Harpal Singh served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc. re #7 Summons Returned Executed, to Withdrawal Proof of Service of Defendant Harpal Singh (Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Harpal Singh served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Rajpal Singh served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Jeff Diggs Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. Bawa, Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Bawa, Inc., Harpal Singh, Rajpal Singh.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correspondence to Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Jeff Diggs Music, Rising George Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Velvet Apple Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8316777.), filed by Hip City Music, Inc., Hilfrost Publishing, Jeff Diggs Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising George Music, Tokeco Tunes, Screen Gems-Emi Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Bawa, Inc., #4 Summons Rajpal Singh, #5 Summons Harpal Singh)(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant