This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:12:00 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Backstage of Indiana LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Backstage of Indiana LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip P Simon and Joshua P Kolar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

Referral Judge

Joshua P Kolar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

THE MUSIC FORCE

LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING

LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC.

PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY

INTERIOR MUSIC CORP.

TEES PUBLISHING, INC.

EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

GREGMARK MUSIC, INC.

AMAZEMENT MUSIC

TONK MUSIC, INC.

Lindseyanne Music Co Inc

Gregmark Music Inc

Tonk Music Inc

Music Force The

Tees Publishing Inc

EMI Consortium Songs Inc

Defendants

BACKSTAGE OF INDIANA, LLC d/b/a BACKSTAGE ON BROADWAY

MARCELL JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

April A Wimberg

Attorney at Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP - Lou/KY

3500 Pnc Tower, 101 S Fifth St

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Schedule

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons Backstage of Indiana LLC dba Backstage on Broadway

1 #4

Proposed Summons Marcell Jackson

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

#7

7 #1

Envelope

#8

8 #1

Envelope

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marcell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Marcell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Law Firm Name (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by April A Wimberg on behalf of Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Interior Music Corp, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Lord and Walker Publishing, Music Force The, Prodisc Music Company, Tees Publishing Inc, Tonk Music Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Backstage of Indiana LLC, Marcell Jackson. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZEMENT MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, TEES PUBLISHING, INC., THE MUSIC FORCE, TONK MUSIC, INC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Broadcast Music, Inc. for AMAZEMENT MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, TEES PUBLISHING, INC., THE MUSIC FORCE, TONK MUSIC, INC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp... (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4111534.), filed by LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., TEES PUBLISHING, INC., AMAZEMENT MUSIC, THE MUSIC FORCE, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., TONK MUSIC, INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Backstage of Indiana LLC dba Backstage on Broadway, #4 Proposed Summons Marcell Jackson)(Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lord and Walker Publishing is a litigant

Latest cases where Gregmark Music Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Interior Music Corp. is a litigant