This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:13:10 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Amber Seattle LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Amber Seattle LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Christel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01004

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Christel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Hip City Music Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

The Music Force

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc.

Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.

Hifrost Publishing

ECAF Music

Fox Film Music Corporation

Rondor Music International, Inc.

Beechwood Music Corporation

Lindseyanne Music Co Inc

Rondor Music International Inc

Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc

Hip City Music Inc

Defendants

Amber Seattle LLC

Ryan Lewis

Amber Restaurant

Henry Youn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Loren D Podwill

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY PC (PORTLAND)

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste 300

Portland, OR 97204

Alexander H Hill

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY PC (PORTLAND)

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste 300

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Gregory P Cavagnaro

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY P CAVAGNARO

2135 112Th Ave Ne

Bellevue, WA 98004

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Henry Youn(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Ryan Lewis(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Amber(pty:dft) by Henry Youn, Ryan Lewis, Amber.(Cavagnaro, Gregory) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/27/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro on behalf of Defendants Amber Seattle LLC, Ryan Lewis, Plaintiff Henry Youn. (Cavagnaro, Gregory) Modified on 8/20/2019 (GMR). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Gregory P. Cavagnaro, on behalf of Henry Youn, on 8/16/2019. (Cavagnaro, Gregory) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amber Seattle LLC dba Amber aka Amber Restaurant, Bar & Lounge on 8/2/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, ECAF Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, The Music Force. (Hill, Alexander) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ryan Lewis on 8/2/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, ECAF Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, The Music Force. (Hill, Alexander) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc; Corporate Parent Capital EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International Inc; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music Inc; Corporate Parent Fox Music, Inc. for Fox Film Music Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc (Podwill, Loren) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Amber Seattle LLC, Ryan Lewis, and Henry Youn. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 7/5/2019. (GT) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Judge David W. Christel added. (GT) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5825012) Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Beechwood Music Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party ECAF Music(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Fox Film Music Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Hifrost Publishing(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Hip City Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party The Music Force(pty:pla), filed by Hifrost Publishing, ECAF Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., The Music Force, Fox Film Music Corporation, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Hip City Music Inc., Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Podwill, Loren) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant