This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 12:55:11 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Alliance Management Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Alliance Management Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01246

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DA Crippler Publishing

Songs of Universal Inc

Soar Loser Music

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

EMI Blackwood Music Inc

Eric B and Rakim Music Inc

Fall Out Boy Inc

Escatawpa Songs LLC

Collipark Music

Broadcast Music Inc

E W C Publishing Co

Fall Out Boy Inc doing business as Chicago X Softcore Songs

Defendants

John F Teevan

Alliance Management Group LLC

Alliance Management Group LLC doing business as St James Gate Irish Pub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bernie W Ellis

Attorney at Burr and Forman LLP

Po Box 447

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Default and of Non-Military Service

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byBroadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Default and of Non-Military Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

9 #1

Affidavit of Service

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. John F Teevan served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

8 #1

Affidavit of Service

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. Alliance Management Group LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc for Broadcast Music Inc.. (Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to Copyright Office (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

2 #1

Schedule 7.1

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule 7.1)(jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Schedule of Songs

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8416735.), filed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. Service due by 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Songs)(jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Docket(#11) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance Management Group LLC, John F Teevan (jbry, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byBroadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Default and of Non-Military Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. John F Teevan served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. Alliance Management Group LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA Inc for Broadcast Music Inc.. (Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to Copyright Office (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broadcast Music Inc, Collipark Music, DA Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, Soar Loser Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule 7.1)(jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8416735.), filed by Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, E W C Publishing Co, Collipark Music, Eric B and Rakim Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, DA Crippler Publishing, Soar Loser Music, Escatawpa Songs LLC. Service due by 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Songs)(jbry, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EWC PUBLISHING, CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fall Out Boy Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Escatawpa Songs L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant