This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 16:06:17 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 2 For 1, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against 2 For 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Full Volume Music

Da Crippler Publishing

BMG Rights Management GMBH

Soar Loser Music

Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

E W C Publishing Co.

Fuel Publishing Inc.

Counting Crows, LLC

Hip City Music Inc.

Hifrost Publishing

EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.

Collipark Music

BMG Rights Management US LLC

Scrap Metal Music

Defendants

Jolynn Romano

Larry Nelson, II

2 For 1, LLC

Lawrence Pawlowski

2 For 1, LLC Individually doing business as Pour Larry's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy R. Covington

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Ave., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice Defendant Lawrence Pawloski. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/23/19. (jrb) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Responses due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/22/19. (trb) Modified on 3/25/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#11

(#11) Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 04/05/2019 by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. 2 For 1, LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Lawrence Pawlowski served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/23/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Larry Nelson, II served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Jolynn Romano served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying TEGNA, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

2 #1

Litigants' Bill of Rights

#2

(#2) General ORDER of pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit - Schedule

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishign Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Schedule)(trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice Defendant Lawrence Pawloski. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/23/19. (jrb) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Responses due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/22/19. (trb) Modified on 3/25/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #12 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant. (trb) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant. (trb) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Pawlowski as Party Defendant by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 04/05/2019 by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 3/22/2019 for Jolynn Romano, Larry Nelson, II, 2 For 1, LLC. Answer due 3/23/2019 for Lawrence Pawlowski. (trb) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. 2 For 1, LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Lawrence Pawlowski served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/23/2019 (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Larry Nelson, II served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) Modified on 3/7/2019 (trb). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishing Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. Jolynn Romano served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying TEGNA, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by BMG Rights Management GMBH, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Da Crippler Publishing, E W C Publishing Co., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Full Volume Music, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Scrap Metal Music, Soar Loser Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2548319. (trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) General ORDER of pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scrap Metal Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Da Crippler Publishing, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., E W C Publishign Co., Soar Loser Music, Counting Crows, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Hifrost Publishing, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Full Volume Music, Hip City Music Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Schedule)(trb) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EWC PUBLISHING, CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant