This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 09:00:01 (UTC).

Britto Central, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Britto Central, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04034

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Britto Central, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

chunquye

putianshilichengqubiquanfuzhuangdian

Zhangxueping

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

111 West Jackson Blvdsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 E. Randolph Dr.Ste. 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

Ruoting Men

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 East Randolphsuite 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#31

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/24/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 9/24/2021. Defendants did not appear nor contact the Court. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #31 is granted. Judgment of default is entered in favor of plaintiff and against remaining defendants identified in first amended Schedule A. Enter Default Judgment Order. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Zhangxueping, chunquye, putianshilichengqubiquanfuzhuangdian by Ruoting Men (Men, Ruoting) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants chunquye, putianshilichengqubiquanfuzhuangdian, Zhangxueping by Tianyu Ju (Ju, Tianyu) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants No. 233 Xue10, No. 234 Yiyu_hg, and No. 220 Cosmose only. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant No. 194 Life 1999 Store only. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment against the defendants identified in first amended schedule A #31 set for 9/24/2021 at 10:30 AM will proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #31 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/24/2021 at 10:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 9/29/2021 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Britto Central, Inc. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Britto Central, Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Britto Central, Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Britto Central, Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Britto Central, Inc. Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Britto Central, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18511586. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruoting Men

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tianyu Ju