This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 11:08:29 (UTC).

Britney v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Britney filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlotte Britney

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Allison Whitten

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700, Tx

Houston, TX 77098

Bradford J Gilde

Attorney at Johnson Law Group.com

2925 Richmond Ave., Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Brandie L Morgenroth

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Tracy J Van Steenburgh

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Exhibit(s) Proof of Service

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Ethicon, Inc. answer due 3/29/2021; Johnson & Johnson answer due 3/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/12/2021.(JLB) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Charlotte Britney. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Charlotte Britney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service)(Whitten, Allison) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Ethicon, Inc. answer due 3/15/2021; Johnson & Johnson answer due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/28/2021.(JLB) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Charlotte Britney. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy J Van Steenburgh on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandie L Morgenroth on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradford J Gilde for Charlotte Britney; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allison Whitten for Charlotte Britney. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/27/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison Whitten. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8421928 filed by Charlotte Britney. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradford Gilde. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8421910 filed by Charlotte Britney. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (MMG) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-159 PJS/LIB. (MMG) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8421202) filed by Charlotte Britney. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison Elizabeth Whitten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford Joe Gilde