This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:04:31 (UTC).

BRISTOW, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED v. AMERIHEALTH CARITAS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 BRISTOW, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AMERIHEALTH CARITAS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00235

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isabella Bristow

Defendant

AMERIHEALTH CARITAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PETER D. WINEBRAKE

Attorney at WINEBRAKE & SANTILLO, LLC

Twining Office Center, Suite 211, 715 Twining Road

Dresher, PA 19025

MICHAEL GROH

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHELLE TOLODZIECKI

Attorney at WINEBRAKE & SANTILLO, LLC

715 Twining Rd, Ste 211

Dresher, PA 19025

R. ANDREW SANTILLO

Attorney at WINEBRAKE & SANTILLO, LLC

Twining Office Center, Suite 211, 715 Twining Road

Dresher, PA 19025

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY BECKER

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DISCLOSURES MADE PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a), IS STAYED PENDING THE COMPLETION OF THE ABOVE-DESCRIBED NOTICE AND OPT-IN PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/11/22. 3/14/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by R. ANDREW SANTILLO on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW (SANTILLO, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

13 #1

Certificate of Service

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by ISABELLA BRISTOW. (WINEBRAKE, PETER) Modified on 2/9/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of ROSEZINA MOY to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL GROH on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW with Certificate of Service(GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of TRENISE PALMER to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

7 #2

JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F.

7 #1

ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER

7 #7

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of JAVENNA AVERY, ROBIN HOLTS, JASMINE MOORE, JUNE MORRISON, YOLANDA SAMPLE, and DENEEN WILSON to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including BMH, LLC with Certificate of Service by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS.(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS.(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE TOLODZIECKI on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Amended Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DISCLOSURES MADE PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a), IS STAYED PENDING THE COMPLETION OF THE ABOVE-DESCRIBED NOTICE AND OPT-IN PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/11/22. 3/14/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by R. ANDREW SANTILLO on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW (SANTILLO, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY BECKER on behalf of AMERIHEALTH CARITAS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BECKER, JEFFREY) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by ISABELLA BRISTOW. (WINEBRAKE, PETER) Modified on 2/9/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of ROSEZINA MOY to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW with Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL GROH on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW with Certificate of Service(GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of TRENISE PALMER to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/15/2022 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATED ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F.)(amw) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (tomg) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by ISABELLA BRISTOW of Consent of JAVENNA AVERY, ROBIN HOLTS, JASMINE MOORE, JUNE MORRISON, YOLANDA SAMPLE, and DENEEN WILSON to Participate in this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including BMH, LLC with Certificate of Service by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS.(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS.(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE TOLODZIECKI on behalf of ISABELLA BRISTOW (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15671317), filed by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation for Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form)(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/20/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/20/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Puma