This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 09:05:49 (UTC).

Bristol v. TransUnion, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Bristol filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02453

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travon Bristol

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Comenity Bank

Midland Credit Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus & Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Kathy Lynn Ducassou

Attorney at Kathy L. Ducassou, Esq.

2383 Sundew Terrace

Baltimore, MD 21209

Defendant Attorneys

Mona Luddy Benach

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Ste 1300

Washington, DC 20004

Gregory Lee Waterworth

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1001 Fleet Street, Ste 9Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202-4359

Lauren M Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Comenity Bank (Waterworth, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#17

(#17) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#15

(#15) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Benach, Mona) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

3 #6

Summons

3 #2

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Trans Union, LLC TransUnion, LLC answer due 12/16/2022. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/23/2022. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/23/2022. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Trans Union, LLC by Travon Bristol (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDeficiency Notice for Comenity Bank -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint by Comenity Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Comenity Bank (Waterworth, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management.(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Benach, Mona) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDeficiency Notice for Equifax Information Services, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/25/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travon Bristol. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022.(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Yitzchak Zelman. Directing attorney Yitzchak Zelman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yitzchak Zelman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10215232.) by Travon Bristol(Ducassou, Kathy) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Midland Credit Management, TransUnion, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMDDC-10197489 (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) -PER COUNSEL, FILED IN ERROR- AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Travon Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Ducassou, Kathy) Modified on 10/7/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Travon Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Ducassou, Kathy) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketThe case of Bristol v. TransUnion, LLC, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is SAG-22-2453. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Travon Bristol was filed incorrectly. **Complaint must contain addresses for all parties. Please file an Amended Complaint, with the addresses of all parties, using the event under Initial Pleadings and Service > Amended Complaint. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Travon Bristol against TransUnion, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Comenity Bank, Midland Credit Management, filed by Travon Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Ducassou, Kathy) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less