This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 09:34:36 (UTC).

Briscoe v. Kroger Texas, L.P.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Briscoe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02162

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Briscoe

Defendant

Kroger Texas, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tomas Osuna

5711 University Hts, Ste 101

San Antonio, TX 78249

George A DeVera

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas J Henry

521 Star Street

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Adraon DelJohn Greene

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr And Smith

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Juvie A Cardenas

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins et al

1301 Mckinney Drive, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DECLARATION, filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#8

(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kim Briscoe, filed.(DeVera, George) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Tomas Osuna to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Tomas Osuna to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Briscoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2021. (DeVera, George) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

2 #1

Supplement

#2

(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit Exh D-4

1 #7

Exhibit Exh D-3

1 #6

Exhibit Exh D-2

1 #5

Exhibit Exh D-1

1 #4

Exhibit Exh D

1 #3

Exhibit Exh C

1 #2

Exhibit Exh B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Jurisdiction District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-32886 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26689681) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh D-1, #6 Exhibit Exh D-2, #7 Exhibit Exh D-3, #8 Exhibit Exh D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION, filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kim Briscoe, filed.(DeVera, George) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Cardenas, Juvie) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Tomas Osuna to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Tomas Osuna to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Briscoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2021. (DeVera, George) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Jurisdiction District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-32886 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26689681) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh D-1, #6 Exhibit Exh D-2, #7 Exhibit Exh D-3, #8 Exhibit Exh D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George A DeVera