Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:44:49 (UTC).

Brindley v. Kirtcher et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Brindley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kirtcher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy L. Brooks and Mark E. Ford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03006

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

Referral Judge

Mark E. Ford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ian Brindley

Berryville, AR 72616

Defendants

Detention Officer Robert Kirtcher

Detention Officer Sasha Reed

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Brindley. Robert Kirtcher served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Sasha Reed served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#13

(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Inmate no longer here. Mail originally sent to Ian Brindley at Carroll County Jail including #10 Order Directing Service, #12 Summons Issued, #11 Clerk's Order PLRA Fee, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983). No new address available. New Address due by 3/30/2020. (lgd) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Carroll County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Carroll County). (lgd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Robert Kirtcher, Sasha Reed and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 12, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #6 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed. Dennis Ledbetter received documents on 2/6/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 2/20/2020. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order and IFP application to the sheriff. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 3, 2020. (src) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) Terminated per Text Only Order entered on 2/12/2020 (lgd). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 13, 2020. (lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) Terminated per text only Order entered on 2/12/2020 (lgd). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Robert Kirtcher, Sasha Reed, filed by Ian Brindley.(lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Brindley. Robert Kirtcher served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Sasha Reed served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Inmate no longer here. Mail originally sent to Ian Brindley at Carroll County Jail including #10 Order Directing Service, #12 Summons Issued, #11 Clerk's Order PLRA Fee, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983). No new address available. New Address due by 3/30/2020. (lgd) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Robert Kirtcher, Sasha Reed and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #10 Order Directing Service, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). (lgd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Carroll County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Carroll County). (lgd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Robert Kirtcher, Sasha Reed and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 12, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [2, 5 & 8] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 12, 2020. (smg) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #6 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed. Dennis Ledbetter received documents on 2/6/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #6 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed as to Sheriff Ross using Certified Mail Article number 7017 2680 0000 5417 5214. (src) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 2/20/2020. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order and IFP application to the sheriff. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 3, 2020. (src) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) Terminated per Text Only Order entered on 2/12/2020 (lgd). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 13, 2020. (lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ian Brindley. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) Terminated per text only Order entered on 2/12/2020 (lgd). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Robert Kirtcher, Sasha Reed, filed by Ian Brindley.(lgd) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less