This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2021 at 10:06:44 (UTC).

Brindell et al v. Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Brindell filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Carlisle Industrial Brake Friction Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Dana Douglas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carolyn Brindell

Connie Dupay

Defendants

Strick Trailers LLC

Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc.

Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co

Pneumo-Abex, LLC

CRA Trailers Inc

Wilson Trailer Co.

Lufkin Gears, LLC

Great Dane LLC

Eaton Corporation

ZF Active Safety US Inc

Meritor Inc

Pneumo-Abex Corp.

Great Dane Limited Partnership

Kelsey-Hayes Company

Port of New Orleans LLC

United States Fidelilty and Guarantee Company

Board of Commissioners for the Port of New Orleans

Honeywell International, Inc.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jean-Michel LeCointre

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy (Alton IL)

One Court Street

Alton, IL 62002

Jeanne Arceneaux

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jacqueline Gagne Badders

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

One Court Street

Alton, IL 62002

Defendant Attorneys

Kay Barnes Baxter

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

650 Poydras St., Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Amanda Luella Deto

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meghan B. Senter

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer E. Adams

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Vikram S. Bhatia

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Dawn Danna Marullo

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Adrejia LaJoy Ann Boutte

Attorney at Self Employed

12063 Mirkwood Ave

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Janice M. Culotta

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

3600 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Remand letter

#28

#27

#26

25 #1

Exhibit

22 #2

Exhibit

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

5 #4

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

5 #3

Exhibit 2

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Remand letter) (jls) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Response to Motion - Exhibit AA, Deposition of Plaintiffs' expert witness, Dr. Brent Staggs - by Eaton Corporation, pursuant to Order at rec. doc. 26. (jls) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Leave to Supplement Exhibit. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/17/2021. (jls) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jls) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of the Emergency Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/17/2021. (jls) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown: Motion Hearing via videoconferencing held on 2/17/2021 re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. Argument held. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (jls) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Exhibit by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit AA)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/17/2021 (jls). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacqueline Gagne Badders. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memo in Support of Remand by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memo in Support of Remand, #3 Exhibit)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean-Michel LeCointre. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc for Eaton Corporation (Senter, Meghan) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Declaration of Meghan B. Senter regarding Compliance with Deadline for Filing Opposition by Eaton Corporation. (Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (jls). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Eaton Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co., Strick Trailers, LLC, CRA Trailers, Inc., and Great Dane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Senter, Meghan) Modified event/text/filers on 2/12/2021 (jls). (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION to Expedite #5 Emergency Motion to Remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand will be brought for submission on 2/17/2021, at 10:00 AM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT any party opposing Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand must file its opposition thereto no later than 2/11/2021 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/8/2021.(pp) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Remand by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/4/2021. (NEF: Section G, MAG-5, MAG-3)(cbs) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Carolyn Brindell, Christopher Brindell, John Brindell, III, Connie Dupay. (Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (cwa). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 19-09716, N-8 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8717842) filed by Eaton Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc., Utility Trailer Manufacturing Co, Pneumo-Abex Corp., Strick Trailers LLC, CRA Trailers Inc, Great Dane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) Attorney Meghan B. Senter added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft).(Senter, Meghan) Modified text/filers on 2/3/2021 (lt). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strick Trailers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Dane LP is a litigant

Latest cases where UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITOR, INC. is a litigant