This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2021 at 07:40:55 (UTC).

Brill v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Brill filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01517

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francis Brill

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Walmart Stores East, LLC

Walmart Stores East, LP

Walmart Stores, Inc..

WSE Management, LLC

WSE Investment, LLC

Walmart

Walmart Stores, Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter #3634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Angel Mae T. Webby-Zola

Attorney at Zola Law Offices

129 Susquehanna Blvd.

West Hazelton, PA 18202

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph J. Shields

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP

1065 Highway 315, Suite 205

Wilkes-Barre, PA 18702

Ryan C. Blazure

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer, LLP

1065 Highway 315, Suite 205

Wilkes-Barre, PA 18702

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 11:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone but may be held in- person if counsel requests and has the concurrence of all other counsel.The courts telephone number is (570) 207-5760. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/22/21. (bs) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by WSE Investment, LLC, WSE Management, LLC, Walmart, Walmart Stores East, LLC, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.., Walmart, Inc..(Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart, Inc.. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart. Walmart waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by WSE Investment, LLC. WSE Investment, LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart Stores East, LP. Walmart Stores East, LP waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by WSE Management, LLC. WSE Management, LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart Stores East, LLC. Walmart Stores East, LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart Stores, Inc.. Walmart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Walmart, Inc.. Walmart, Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Shields on behalf of WSE Investment, LLC, WSE Management, LLC, Walmart, Walmart Stores East, LLC, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.., Walmart, Inc.. (Shields, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Blazure on behalf of Walmart, Walmart Stores East, LLC, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.., Walmart, Inc. (Blazure, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/14/21. (bs) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores, Inc. d/b/a Walmart Supercenter #3634 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to WSE Investment, LLC, WSE Management, LLC, Walmart, Walmart Stores East, LLC, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Stores, Inc.., Walmart, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (sm) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Walmart, Inc., et al ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5685706), filed by Francis Brill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSE Investment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant