This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2022 at 07:40:30 (UTC).

Briley v. Copeland

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Briley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Copeland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roderick C. Young and Mark R. Colombell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roderick C. Young

Referral Judge

Mark R. Colombell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curvonte Lamont Briley

Henrico, VA 23228

Defendant

Copeland

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Copeland, filed by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

1 #1

Exhibits

1 #2

Envelope

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 10/31/2022. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#4

(#4) Consent to Collection of Fees by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

4 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Screening Action) - It is ORDERED that: The action is FILED and Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will now review the action in accordance with federal law. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/8/2022. (Copy of Memorandum Order sent to Plaintiff and Institution. Consent to Collection of Fees form sent to Institution) (smej, ) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Screening Action) - It is ORDERED that: The action is FILED and Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will now review the action in accordance with federal law. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/8/2022. (Copy of Memorandum Order sent to Plaintiff and Institution. Consent to Collection of Fees form sent to Institution) (smej, ) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent to Collection of Fees by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 10/31/2022. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Copeland, filed by Curvonte Lamont Briley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COPELAND CORPORATION LLC is a litigant