This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 09:37:51 (UTC).

Brigman v. MicroVention, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 09, 2021, Kevin S. Brigman (“Brigman” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Steven E. Nauman of Morgan & Morgan, PA, filed a personal injury lawsuit against MicroVention, Inc. (“MicroVention'' or “Defendant”), seeking actual, consequential, economic and non- economic damages for allegedly manufacturing, producing and distributing a malfunctioned, defective and unreasonably dangerous range of cardiovascular and neuroendovascular products to treat various neurovascular disorders. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida with Judge Gregory J. Kelly and Wendy W. Berger presiding.

 

In his complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “MicroVention manufactures, produces, and distributes the MicroPlex Coil System to help treat aneurysms. The MicroPlex Coil System consists of an implantable embolization coil attached to a coil delivery device. The embolization coil is implanted into a patient by inserting the device into the patient’s femoral artery and maneuvering the coil through a microcatheter until reaching the aneurysm. The coil is then placed into the aneurysm and released using the delivery device. After placement, the coil is designed to expand and fill the aneurysm in order to promote clotting. Brigman suffered an aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage that caused a wide neck basilar apex aneurysm to form in his brain.  On May 1, 2017, Brigman’s surgical team attempted to use MicroVention’s MicroPlex Coil System, including embolization coils and delivery device, to help treat Brigman’s aneurysm”.

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “As Brigman’s surgeon attempted to place an embolization coil in the aneurysm, the MicroPlex Coil System suddenly malfunctioned, causing the coil to unexpectedly detach and break within Brigman’s brain without the surgeon using the delivery device. Although Brigman’s surgical team worked to remove the broken embolization coil from Brigman’s brain, they could not remove the entire coil and were forced to abandon the procedure. As a result, a piece of the broken embolization coil remained in Brigman’s brain. Brigman was immediately rushed to the ICU in critical condition. Upon awakening following the procedure, Brigman was observed to have partial paralysis on the right side of his body, including right facial droop, impaired speech, and impaired function of his right arm and leg. Despite several months of intense physical therapy, occupational therapy, and speech therapy, Brigman has not recovered from his injuries and continues to suffer to this day. The defective condition of the MicroPlex Coil System and the component embolization coil and delivery device that were used on Brigman rendered them unreasonably dangerous for their designed, intended, and anticipated uses.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, which are regarding alleged strict liability because the MicroPlex Coil System and the component embolization coil and delivery device that were used on Brigman are allegedly defective and unreasonably dangerous. The second claim is for alleged negligence because MicroVention owed a duty to properly manufacture, produce, and distribute the MicroPlex Coil System and the component embolization coil and delivery device that were used on Brigman so that they were not in a defective and unsafe condition.

 

In his prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to award a judgment against Defendant MicroVention, Inc. for all injuries and damages sustained, including all actual damages, consequential damages, economic damages, non-economic damages, punitive damages, mental anguish, emotional distress, pain and suffering, costs, and interest, and for any such further relief as the Court deems appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00639

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEVIN BRIGMAN

Kevin S. Brigman

Defendants

MICROVENTION INC

MicroVention, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven E. Nauman

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Andrew Parker Felix

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

#4

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on 06/01/2021 by Kevin S. Brigman as to MicroVention, Inc.. (Nauman, Steven) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kevin S. Brigman. Related case(s): No (Nauman, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kevin S. Brigman. Related case(s): No (Nauman, Steven) (INCORRECT TITLE ON PDF. REFILED AT DOC #9.) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kevin S. Brigman. (Nauman, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/21/2021. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/13/2021. (HMK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to MicroVention, Inc. (TNP) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0639-WWB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MicroVention, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18117833) filed by Kevin S. Brigman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Nauman, Steven) Modified text on 4/12/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MicroVention, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Parker Felix

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Nauman