This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:51:12 (UTC).

BrightSpring Health Services, Inc. v. Foster et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 BrightSpring Health Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Foster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.

Phoenix Parent Holdings, Inc.

Defendants

Timothy W. Foster

DB Grant Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John H Newcomer, Jr.

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

James H. McMackin, III

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Matthew A. Boyd

Ronald G. Polly

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER Granting #28 Request to temporarily stay all proceedings in this matter. All current deadlines shall be stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#29

(#29) REDACTED VERSION of #22 Second Declaration of L. Bradley Williams, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/29/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#25

(#25) REDACTED VERSION of #22 Declaration of L. Bradley Williams, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/20/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Redacted Version of Amended Complaint (D.I. #23 ), by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/8/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#23

(#23) REDACTED VERSION of #21 Amended Complaint by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#19

(#27) ORAL ORDER: Answers was due to be filed on 4/22/2022 (see D.I. #18 , D.I. #19 ), and to date none have been. Plaintiff is directed to file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#18

(#27) ORAL ORDER: Answers was due to be filed on 4/22/2022 (see D.I. #18 , D.I. #19 ), and to date none have been. Plaintiff is directed to file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

4 #2

7.1 Statement

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

7.1 Statement

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER Granting #28 Request to temporarily stay all proceedings in this matter. All current deadlines shall be stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/29/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REDACTED VERSION of #22 Second Declaration of L. Bradley Williams, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/29/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORAL ORDER: Answers was due to be filed on 4/22/2022 (see D.I. #18 , D.I. #19 ), and to date none have been. Plaintiff is directed to file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORAL ORDER: The redacted filing (D.I. #25 ) is REJECTED because parts of it are redacted in its entirety. Absent a compelling reason, supported by a statement under oath by a party, redactions in their entirety are impermissible; redactions must be done so as to redact the least possible amount of the materials submitted. Failure to make a good faith attempt at such redactions may result in sanctions, the most common of which would be simply unsealing the entire filing. Redacting in its entirety a document that contains publicly available materials is prima facie evidence of bad faith. Revised redacted filings are DUE within five business days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/21/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REDACTED VERSION of #22 Declaration of L. Bradley Williams, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/20/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #22 . (nms) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Redacted Version of Amended Complaint (D.I. #23 ), by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) Modified on 4/8/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to BrightSpring Health Services, Inc. re #23 Redacted Document. Upon review it was determined that this filing does not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Plaintiff is directed to supplement the docket with a certificate of service for this filing. (nms) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REDACTED VERSION of #21 Amended Complaint by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Newcomer, John) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Expedite Discovery - filed by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement)(mal) Modified on 3/30/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Jeff Chapuran in support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Stephen Myers in support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [SEALED] EXHIBITS C-J to #6 DECLARATION of L. Bradley Williams, by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (mal) Modified on 3/30/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of L. Bradley Williams in support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B and K-N)(mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/12/2022. (mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - filed by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement)(mal) Modified on 3/30/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed against DB Grant Associates, Inc., Timothy W. Foster - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3837084.) - filed by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to File Under Seal - filed by BrightSpring Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement)(mal) . Modified on 3/30/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H. McMackin, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald G. Polly, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A. Boyd