This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:10:46 (UTC).

Bright v. TOMPKINS et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Bright filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against TOMPKINS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10283

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julius Knight Bright

Boston, MA 02118

Defendants

Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN

STEVEN W TOMPKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Irene C. Freidel

Attorney at PAIR Project

98 N. Washington Street, Suite 106

Boston, MA 02114

Defendant Attorney

Jason C. Weida

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - MA

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Julius Knight Bright. (Freidel, Irene) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause by Julius Knight Bright.(Freidel, Irene) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kirstjen M NIELSEN, STEVEN W TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #6 Service Order - 2241 Petition by Kirstjen M NIELSEN, STEVEN W TOMPKINS.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Julius Knight Bright.(Freidel, Irene) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Julius Knight Bright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Freidel, Irene) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7539454 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Julius Knight Bright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Freidel, Irene) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.