This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2023 at 09:22:53 (UTC).

Bright v. Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 Bright filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ewing Werlein, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04286

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Twansha Bright

Defendants

Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.

Ryder Integrated Logistics of Texas, LLC

Blackline Cold Storage, LLC

Blackline Cold Storage Houston Owner, LLC

Jason Warren

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Grable

Christopher James Baker

Defendant Attorney

William O Ashcraft

 

Court Documents

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #3

Exhibit 2

6 #2

Exhibit 1

6 #1

Appendix

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order on Motion to Remand

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Twansha Bright, filed.(Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackline Cold Storage Houston Owner, LLC, Blackline Cold Storage, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics of Texas, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Jason Warren, filed.(Ashcraft, William) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit I - Excerpts from Warehouse Management Agreement

1 #8

Exhibit H - Employee Statement of Marshall Green

1 #6

Exhibit F - Supervisor Investigation Report

1 #5

Exhibit E - List of All Counsel of Record

1 #4

Exhibit D - Index of All Matters Filed

1 #2

Exhibit B - Pleadings Asserting Causes of Action and All Answers to Such Pleadin

1 #1

Exhibit A - Executed Processes in Case

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Blackline Cold Storage Houston Owner, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Ashcraft, William) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Twansha Bright, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order on Motion to Remand)(Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Twansha Bright, filed.(Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackline Cold Storage Houston Owner, LLC, Blackline Cold Storage, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics of Texas, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Jason Warren, filed.(Ashcraft, William) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court - Harris County, case number 2022-73232 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29187925) filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics of Texas, LLC, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Blackline Cold Storage Houston Owner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Processes in Case, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings Asserting Causes of Action and All Answers to Such Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Sheet for State Court Action, #4 Exhibit D - Index of All Matters Filed, #5 Exhibit E - List of All Counsel of Record, #6 Exhibit F - Supervisor Investigation Report, #7 Exhibit G - Jason Warren Statement, #8 Exhibit H - Employee Statement of Marshall Green, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Warehouse Management Agreement, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashcraft, William) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less