This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2023 at 09:31:10 (UTC).

Bright Data Ltd. v. Teso LT, UAB

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Bright Data Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Teso LT, UAB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bright Data Ltd.

Defendant

Teso LT, UAB doing business as Oxylabs, UAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Blake Thompson

J. Mark Mann

Korula T. Cherian

Thomas M. Dunham

Robert Harkins

Stephanie R. Wood

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Christopher Govett

Felicia J. Boyd

Anthony Matthew Garza

Christopher T. Bovenkamp

Daniel S. Leventhal

Gabriel Scott Culver

Martin C. Robson, III

Steven Chase Callahan

 

Court Documents

36 #6

Proposed Order

36 #5

Exhibit E

36 #4

Exhibit D

36 #3

Exhibit C

36 #2

Exhibit B

36 #1

Exhibit A

#36

(#36) MOTION to Dismiss by Teso LT, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brett Govett, Felicia Boyd, Daniel Leventhal, Gabriel Culver and the law firm of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP by Teso LT, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

1 #29

Exhibit AB

1 #21

Exhibit T

1 #20

Exhibit S

1 #19

Exhibit R

1 #16

Exhibit O

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #4

Exhibit C

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) MOTION to Dismiss by Teso LT, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brett Govett, Felicia Boyd, Daniel Leventhal, Gabriel Culver and the law firm of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP by Teso LT, UAB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Withdraw 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Teso LT, UAB, re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF TOMAS MONTVILAS, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(lad) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklc) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #21 Report and Recommendations, Denying 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bright Data Ltd... Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to #1 Complaint ; Teso LT, UAB answer due 3/27/2023. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin C. Robson, III on behalf of Teso LT, UAB. Attorney Martin C. Robson, III added to party Teso LT, UAB(pty:dft) (Robson, Martin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Matthew Garza on behalf of Teso LT, UAB. Attorney Anthony Matthew Garza added to party Teso LT, UAB(pty:dft) (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher T. Bovenkamp on behalf of Teso LT, UAB. Attorney Christopher T. Bovenkamp added to party Teso LT, UAB(pty:dft) (Bovenkamp, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
02/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Teso LT, UAB. Attorney Steven Chase Callahan added to party Teso LT, UAB(pty:dft) (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 02/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of Teso LT, UAB. Attorney Brett Christopher Govett added to party Teso LT, UAB(pty:dft) (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bright Data Ltd.. Teso LT, UAB served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER Setting Zoom Motion Hearing for 2/7/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot1) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Teso LT, UAB. (lad) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bright Data Ltd.. (Thompson, G.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/30/2023) (lad). REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bright Data Ltd.. (Thompson, G.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/30/2023) (lad). (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketPursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare a form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (lad) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTXWDC-17019922), filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit AB)(Harkins, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less