This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 08:28:50 (UTC).

Bridges et al v. Eagle Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Bridges filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Eagle Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04392

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darren Bridges

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Eagle Inc.

Viacom CBS, Inc.

International Paper Company

Union Carbide Corporation

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

General Electric Company

Crane Co.

Uniroyal, Inc.

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Clark-Reliance Corporation

Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Defendant

General Electric Company

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremiah S. Boling

Attorney at Boling Law Firm

541 Julia Street, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Benjamin David Rumph

Attorney at The Boling Law Firm

541 Julia Street, Ste 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Caroline Boling

Attorney at Boling Law Firm

541 Julia Street, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

LaCrisha McAllister

Attorney at Boling Law Firm

541 Julia Street, Ste 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Perrey S. Lee

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Ernest G. Foundas

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Francis Xavier deBlanc, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

David M. Stein

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Other Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#46

(#46) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#45

(#45) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Paramount Global. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#44

(#44) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (js) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#43

(#43) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (js) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#42

(#42) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by Foster Wheeler LLC re #40 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#41

(#41) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by General Electric Company re #39 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#40

(#40) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages and, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC.Attorney Roth Martin Hainkel added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft).(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#39

(#39) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Haley Zhu-Butler is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Haley Zhu-Butler is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#3

(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(js) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#39) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ANSWER to #10 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Paramount Global. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (js) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (js) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by Foster Wheeler LLC re #40 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim,. (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by General Electric Company re #39 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages and, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC.Attorney Roth Martin Hainkel added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft).(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Bluewater Rubber & Gasket Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation, Crane Co., Eagle Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Company, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, New Orleans Flooring Supply, Inc., Orion South Incorporated, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., Viacom CBS, Inc., William Powell Company by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 11/17/2022 (cs). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record-Part 2)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 11/17/2022 (cs). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Haley Zhu-Butler is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/15/2022. (jls) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Haley Zhu-Butler. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (jls) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Haley Zhu-Butler by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Haley Zhu-Butler added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pd).(Zhu-Butler, Haley) Modified text on 11/15/2022 (jls). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(js) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-6964 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9643832) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pd).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIACOM CBS INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Inc. is a litigant