This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:44:31 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. Mirage Universal, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Mirage Universal, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00366

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendants

Does 1-10

Mirage Universal, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Courts Order to Show Cause #11 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 USC 1367(c)(4). (et) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

11 #5

Proof of Service

11 #4

Exhibit 2

11 #3

Exhibit 1

11 #2

Declaration

11 #1

Declaration

#11

(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tj) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mirage Universal, LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25114553 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Courts Order to Show Cause #11 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 USC 1367(c)(4). (et) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tj) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mirage Universal, LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25114553 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less