This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:39:49 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. Dobacor HQ LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Dobacor HQ LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson, John F. Walter and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05918

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendants

Does 1-10

Dobacor HQ LLC

Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

David H Stern

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

Nicole Cherie Delgado

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew S Wong

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

David H. Stern

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant #25 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#25

(#25) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker.(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Dobacor HQ LLC, Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC, identifying Dobacor HQ LLC; Dobacor Mezzanine LLC; The Dobacor LLC; Dobacor Real Estate Fund LP; Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC; Sophie LaMontagne; Katherine Berman; The Hartford. (Delgado, Nicole) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Dobacor HQ LLC, Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC.(Delgado, Nicole) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM. Court Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 10, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 16, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 20, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant #25 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker.(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Dobacor HQ LLC, Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC, identifying Dobacor HQ LLC; Dobacor Mezzanine LLC; The Dobacor LLC; Dobacor Real Estate Fund LP; Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC; Sophie LaMontagne; Katherine Berman; The Hartford. (Delgado, Nicole) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Dobacor HQ LLC, Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC.(Delgado, Nicole) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM. Court Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 10, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 16, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 20, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker.. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dobacor HQ LLC answer now due 9/5/2019; Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC answer now due 9/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Dobacor HQ LLC.(Attorney Nicole Cherie Delgado added to party Dobacor HQ LLC(pty:dft))(Delgado, Nicole) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: BUSINESS FILINGS INCORPORATED(C2113485)(Daisy Montenegro-Intake Specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Dobacor HQ LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC. (C1941323)(Daisy Montenegro-Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Dobacor HQ LLC, Georgetown Cupcake Los Angeles, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24056766 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David H. Stern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S Wong