This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:44:26 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. Capricorn Realty, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Capricorn Realty, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendants

Does 1-10

Farshid Yassian

United Cleaners & Laundry

Capricorn Realty, Inc.

United Cleaners and Laundry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Azim Khanmohamed

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Robert Michael Collum

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Marc A Collins

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Ashton Ryan Watkins

Attorney at Law Offices of Ashton R Watkins

660 South Figueroa Street Suite 1960

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#16

(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Toke Aw in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry.(Attorney Ashton Ryan Watkins added to party United Cleaners and Laundry(pty:dft))(Watkins, Ashton) (Entered: 03/07/2020)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc., (Collins, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#18

(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #17 served on 3/1/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Sandy Khalil in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

10 #1

Declaration

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#1

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc..(Attorney Marc A Collins added to party Capricorn Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Collins, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Order to Show Cause, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Capricorn Realty, Inc., United Cleaners and Laundry, Farshid Yassian (representative capacity as trustee of The Farshid Yassian Trust dated June 27, 2012), Farshid Yassian (in individual ). (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc..(Attorney Marc A Collins added to party Capricorn Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Collins, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO DEFENDANT UNITED CLEANERS AND LAUNDRY by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Notice of Interested Parties shall be filed not later than 10:00 am on March 13, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry.(Attorney Ashton Ryan Watkins added to party United Cleaners and Laundry(pty:dft))(Watkins, Ashton) (Entered: 03/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc., (Collins, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc..(Attorney Marc A Collins added to party Capricorn Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Collins, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #17 served on 3/1/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Capricorn Realty, Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Toke Aw in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant United Cleaners and Laundry served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Sandy Khalil in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Farshid Yassian(representative capacity as trustee of The Farshid Yassian Trust dated June 27, 2012), (Collins, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Order to Show Cause, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 1/23/2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 USC 1367(c). (jp) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Capricorn Realty, Inc., United Cleaners and Laundry, Farshid Yassian (representative capacity as trustee of The Farshid Yassian Trust dated June 27, 2012), Farshid Yassian (in individual ). (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25114524 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less