This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 13:01:53 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against C and J Clark Retail, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02665

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendant

C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Monica H Bullock

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Specterum Center Drive Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92679

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. answer now due 3/5/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc..(Attorney Monica H Bullock added to party C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CT Corporation (Jessie Gastelum intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29774445 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. answer now due 3/5/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc..(Attorney Monica H Bullock added to party C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CT Corporation (Jessie Gastelum intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant C. and J. Clark Retail, Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29774445 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & J Clark Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Hartman Bullock