This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 08:08:56 (UTC).

Brian Whitaker v. Anjan Fashion Buildings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Brian Whitaker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Anjan Fashion Buildings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08337

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Whitaker

Defendants

Does 1-10

Anjan Fashion Buildings, LLC

9th St. Ramen, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Stephen E Abraham

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #2

Proof of Service

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been advised by Plaintiff that this action has settled by Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate All Currently Set Dates #12 , hereby orders all proceedings, if any, vacated and the action dismissed without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 9th St. Ramen, LLC answer now due 10/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, #9 filed by Defendant 9th St. Ramen, LLC.(Attorney Stephen E Abraham added to party 9th St. Ramen, LLC(pty:dft))(Abraham, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Anjan Fashion Buildings, LLC served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margarita Rodriquez, property manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant 9th St. Ramen, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Joyce Yi - Manager, LegalZoom.com, Inc.,, Agent for Service of Process. (Ballister, Raymond) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants 9th St. Ramen, LLC, Anjan Fashion Buildings, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28044322 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen E Abraham